EP1389783 - Radiation image storage panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukui, Shinichiro c/o Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kido, Takeo Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018371.9 | 13.08.2003 | [2004/08] | Priority number, date | JP20020236546 | 14.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002236546 | JP20020246974 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002246974 | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389783 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1389783 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G21K4/00 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US);
G21K2004/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/36] |
Former [2004/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schirm zum Speichern eines Strahlungsbildes | [2004/08] | English: | Radiation image storage panel | [2004/08] | French: | Ecran pour l'enregistrement d'une image obtenue par rayonnement | [2004/08] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0185534 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 7,9,12 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 9 * * page 31, line 14 - page 34, line 20 * [Y] 8,10-11,13-16; | [A]US4939018 (KOHDA KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 18 *; | [A]US5023461 (NAKAZAWA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-3 ** column 10, line 35 - column 12, line 38 *; | [Y]JPH1012376 (KANSAI NIPPON ELECTRIC) [Y] 7-16 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH11344598 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [Y] 7-16 * abstract * |