EP1389588 - Container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imex Co., Ltd. 12-48, Kohamanishi 1-chome, Suminoe-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states Imex Co., Ltd. 12-48, Kohamanishi 1-chome, Suminoe-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsutsumi Yoji 3-2, Sakasedai 6-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018400.6 | 13.08.2003 | [2004/08] | Priority number, date | JP20020235880 | 13.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002235880 | JP20020380551 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002380551 | JP20030187657 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003187657 | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389588 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/12, A45D34/04 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
B65D55/12 (EP,US);
A45D34/045 (EP,US);
A45D40/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/46] |
Former [2004/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behälter | [2004/08] | English: | Container | [2004/08] | French: | Récipient | [2004/08] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.07.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE491938 (GEORG SCHAPER) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE2903401 (VOGELSANG K GMBH) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4918520 (KATSUOKA NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE19629392 (AHRENS HANS JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO9944908 (AHRENS ELVIRA [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure - * |