EP1510892 - Process and control system for operating a technical plant comprising plural components, in particular a combustion plant for production of electrical energy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreiber, Roland Am Eisenberg 33 36341 Lauterbach / DE | [2005/09] | Application number, filing date | 03018411.3 | 13.08.2003 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510892 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25368 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2649 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (US);
Y04S20/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Steuerungssystem zum Betrieb einer mehrere Komponenten umfassenden technischen Anlage, insbesondere einer Verbrennungsanlage zum Erzeugen von elektrischer Energie | [2005/09] | English: | Process and control system for operating a technical plant comprising plural components, in particular a combustion plant for production of electrical energy | [2005/09] | French: | Procédé et système de commande pour opérer une installation technique comportant plusieurs composants, en particulier une installation de combustion pour la production d'énergie électrique | [2005/09] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2005/12: test | Examination procedure | 14.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Drawings | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Drawings {1} | 03.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.10.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61285314 ; | [Y]DE19744230 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 19 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-4 *; | [YD]WO02052199 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870520), vol. 011, no. 155, Database accession no. (M - 589), & JP61285314 A 19861216 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | WO02052199 |