EP1391523 - Twin-furnaces unit for steel production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kersten, Dieter Jägerstrasse 204 45699 Herten / DE | 02 /
Schaller, Hans Ludwig Kornstrasse 40A 47443 Moers / DE | 03 /
Schubert, Manfred Zum Brunsloh 12 46147 Oberhausen / DE | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter, et al Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Klüppel, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2004/09] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018545.8 | 18.08.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | DE2002137974 | 20.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10237974 | DE2003132866 | 19.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10332866 | [2004/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391523 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391523 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/28, C21C5/52, F27B3/06, F27B3/08, F27B3/28 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
F27B3/06 (EP);
C21C5/5252 (EP);
C21C5/5294 (EP);
F27B3/085 (EP);
F27B3/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/09] | Title | German: | Doppelofenanlage für die Erzeugung von Stahlwerkstoffen | [2004/09] | English: | Twin-furnaces unit for steel production | [2004/09] | French: | Deux cuves installation pour la production d'acier | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 29.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.05.2006 | CZ | 24.05.2006 | EE | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | FR | 24.05.2006 | IE | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | RO | 24.05.2006 | SI | 24.05.2006 | SK | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | LU | 18.08.2006 | BG | 24.08.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
LU | 18.08.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01314888 ; | [YA]DE4138120 (FUCHS TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1 * column 1, lines 16-28; figures 1-3; claims 1-3 * * column 2, lines 43-65 * [A] 2-10; | [AD]US5602867 (HUEBERS ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [AD]US5961688 (MEIERLING PETER [DE], et al); | [YA]DE19823226 (ARCMET TECHNOLOGIE GMBH LINZ [AT]) [Y] 1 * column 1, lines 50-58; figure 1 * [A] 2-10; | [A]US6238453 (ROSE LUTZ [DE], et al); | [A] - LEMKE S ET AL, "TAILORED SOLUTIONS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF QUALITY STEEL", MPT. METALLURGICAL PLANT AND PLANT AND TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, VERLAG STAHLEISEN, DUESSELDORF, DE, (200108), vol. 24, no. 4, ISSN 0935-7254, pages 72 - 74,76,78,80,82,84,86-87, XP009010639 [A] 1-10 * figures 6,11,17 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900302), vol. 014, no. 113, Database accession no. (M - 0944), & JP01314888 A 19891220 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |