EP1375192 - Paintbox with exchangeable colour bowls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pelikan PBS-Produktionsgesellschaft mbH & Co. KG Werftstrasse 9 30163 Hannover / DE | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholz, Günter Hegerwisch 6 30823 Garbsen / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018556.5 | 15.12.2000 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | DE1999162897 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19962897 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1375192 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1375192 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375192 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B44D3/04 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B44D3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Farbkasten mit auswechselbaren Farbschälchen | [2004/01] | English: | Paintbox with exchangeable colour bowls | [2004/01] | French: | Boite de peinture ayant des coupelles de peinture interchangeables | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00990545.6 / EP1244560 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IE | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/14] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 18.02.2009 | |
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 18.02.2009 | |
ES | 29.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB378795 (LIEBETRUTH & CO GES MIT BESCHR, et al) [A] 1-9* page 2, lines 19-44; figure 1 *; | [A]DE629787 (LIEBETRUTH & CO G M B H A) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE699165 (HANS REBHAN) [A] 1-7 * page 2, lines 70-90; figure 2 * |