EP1391834 - Document retrieval system and question answering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomoto, Masako 7-18-504, Minamisumiyoshi Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-1125 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Mitsuhiro 4-11-11, Miyanosato Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0216 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Hiroyuki 4-22-10-501, Shimokodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0041 / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018569.8 | 18.08.2003 | [2004/09] | Priority number, date | JP20020238031 | 19.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002238031 | JP20030189111 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003189111 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1391834 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1391834 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
G06F16/3329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/09] | Title | German: | Dokumentwiederauffindungssystem und Frage-Antwortsystem | [2004/09] | English: | Document retrieval system and question answering system | [2004/09] | French: | Système de recouvrement de documents et système de questions/réponses | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 19.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ATTARDI G ET AL, "The PISAB question answering system", TEXT RETRIEVAL CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS, (20001113), pages 621 - 626, XP002246949 [X] 1-36 * abstract * * page 622, line 37 - page 623, line 5; figures 1,2 * * page 624, line 1 - page 625, line 25; figures 3,5 * | [X] - ATTARDI G ET AL, "PiQASso: Pisa Question Answering System", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TENTH TEXT RETRIEVAL CONFERENCE, Gaithersburg, MD, USA, (20011113), pages 633 - 641, URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/attardi01piqasso.html, (20051116), XP002355125 [X] 1-36 * abstract * * paragraph 4 "Question analysis" * * paragraph 5 "Query formulation and expansion" * * paragraph 7 "Extracting relations" * | [A] - ABNEY S ET AL, "Answer Extraction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH APPLIED NATURAL LANGUAGE PROCESSING CONFERENCE, (200004), pages 296 - 301, URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/abney00answer.html, (20051116), XP002355126 [A] 1-36 * abstract * * page 296, column R, line 35 - page 297, column L, line 44 * * page 298, column L, line 5 - column R, line 37 * |