EP1366787 - Die capable of being opened [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/39] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dewa, Shoji c/o Konami Corporation 4-1,2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | 02 /
Takatoku, Akihiro c/o Konami Corporation 4-1,2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | [2004/24] |
Former [2003/49] | 01 /
Dewa, Shoji Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takatoku, Akihiro Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018749.6 | 14.02.2001 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000040936 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000040936 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1366787 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1366787 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366787 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/04 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
A63F9/0413 (EP,US);
A63F9/04 (KR);
A63F2009/0497 (EP,US);
A63F2250/484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | Würfel, der geöffnet werden kann | [2003/49] | English: | Die capable of being opened | [2003/49] | French: | Dé pouvant être ouvert | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01103483.2 / EP1136103 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.2007 | BE | 26.09.2007 | CH | 26.09.2007 | CY | 26.09.2007 | DK | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | LI | 26.09.2007 | NL | 26.09.2007 | TR | 26.09.2007 | SE | 26.12.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | DE | 28.12.2007 | ES | 06.01.2008 | IE | 14.02.2008 | LU | 14.02.2008 | PT | 26.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
TR | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.02.2008 | ||
LU | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.02.2008 | ||
LU | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
IE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 26.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8705084U (HELLMUTH FLECK) [X] 1,2* page 1, paragraph 3; figure III; claim 1.1 * |