EP1450289 - Analog Divider Circuit and Method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karlquist, Richard K. 21861 Alcazar Avenue Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03018878.3 | 19.08.2003 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | US20020328304 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: US 328304 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450289 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/16 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
G06G7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/20] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Analoge Teilerschaltung und Vefahren dazu | [2004/35] | English: | Analog Divider Circuit and Method | [2004/35] | French: | Circuit diviseur analogique et son procédé | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1227574 (BOLT ERNEST J [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 12 - column 4, line 80; figure 1 *; | [A]US3321614 (LEVADI VICTOR S) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 10 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]US3710088 (BLASCHKE F, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 62; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0315268 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10* page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 51; figure 1 * |