EP1396209 - Storing and applying device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEKA BRUSH GMBH 91572 Bechhofen-Waizendorf / DE | [2006/31] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states GEKA BRUSH GMBH 91572 Bechhofen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumler, Norbert Zierlweg 4 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019035.9 | 22.08.2003 | [2004/11] | Priority number, date | DE2002141218 | 06.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10241218 | [2004/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1396209 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1396209 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A46B11/00 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A46B11/0072 (EP,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
A45D34/043 (EP,US);
A45D2200/1018 (EP,US);
A45D40/262 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1046 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1053 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | Vorrats- und Applikatoreinheit | [2004/11] | English: | Storing and applying device | [2004/11] | French: | Appareil de stockage et d'application | [2004/11] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 09.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06000346.4 / EP1647203 | EP06000347.2 / EP1647204 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | IE | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | RO | 02.08.2006 | SI | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | AT | 22.08.2006 | LU | 22.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | HU | 03.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
LU | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
HU | 03.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
HU | 03.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
AT | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US933274 (SWANBERG JULIUS [US]) [Y] 3-10 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE4005419 (SCHATTA MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * the whole document * [Y] 3-10; | [XY]DE19647617 (ERN GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * the whole document * [Y] 3-10; | [Y]JPH10192048 (KAO CORP) [Y] 3-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US6238117 (GRIEBEL ULRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 3-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6260557 (YARBROUGH CHRISTINE [US]) [Y] 9* the whole document * |