EP1405575 - Protective helmet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uvex Sports GmbH & Co. KG Fichtenstrasse 43 90763 Fürth / DE | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grau, Werner Rosenstrasse 32 86316 Haberskirch / DE | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019121.7 | 23.08.2003 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | DE2002215102U | 01.10.2002 Original published format: DE 20215102 U | [2004/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1405575 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1405575 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405575 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/04, A42B3/06 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
A42B3/0493 (EP);
A42B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | LT | 05.09.2006 | LV | 05.09.2006 | Title | German: | Schutzhelm | [2004/15] | English: | Protective helmet | [2004/15] | French: | Casque de protection | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.10.2008 | CZ | 22.10.2008 | DK | 22.10.2008 | EE | 22.10.2008 | FI | 22.10.2008 | IE | 22.10.2008 | IT | 22.10.2008 | NL | 22.10.2008 | RO | 22.10.2008 | SI | 22.10.2008 | SK | 22.10.2008 | TR | 22.10.2008 | BG | 22.01.2009 | SE | 22.01.2009 | GR | 23.01.2009 | ES | 02.02.2009 | PT | 23.03.2009 | HU | 23.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
HU | 23.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
GR | 23.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
IT | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | DK | 22.10.2008 | |
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
SE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 22.10.2008 | |
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
RO | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 22.10.2008 | |
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 22.10.2008 | |
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BG | 22.01.2009 | |
ES | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 02.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE353026 (L. M. P. BAHON); | [A]DE644257 (NIERHAUS & CO FRIEDR); | [A]US3548410 (PARKER JERRY W) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 42 - line 62 * * column 2, lines 19-22, 69-72 * * column 3, line 1, paragraph 3 - line 41 * * figure - *; | [A]US4370758 (MATTHEIS DALE B [US]); | [A]EP0131929 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]FR2676336 (STAND 21 SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 21 - line 29 * * page 5, line 11 - line 24 * * page 6, lines 3-9,27-35 * * figure . *; | [A]EP1062884 (O G K HANBAI CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE20101053U (SCHUBERTH WERK KG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 14 - line 16 * * figure 2 * |