EP1365254 - A method of aligning predicted navigation information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Phil Fu-Wei 2 Farmstead Road Denville, New Jersey 07834 / US | 02 /
Zidel, Andrew Todd 52 Bell Drive Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2003/48] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03019141.5 | 19.02.2001 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | US20000635617 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: US 635617 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1365254 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/04, G01S5/14 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
G01S19/25 (EP);
G01C21/00 (KR);
G01S19/254 (EP,KR);
G01S19/256 (EP,KR);
G01S19/258 (EP,KR);
G01S19/35 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausrichten von vorausgesagter Navigationsinformation | [2003/48] | English: | A method of aligning predicted navigation information | [2003/48] | French: | Procédé d'alignement d'information de navigation prévue | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2010 | 19.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/17] | 17.12.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01301419.6 / EP1184674 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5798732 (ESCHENBACH RALPH F [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 2 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 21 *; | [A]WO9957573 (SNAPTRACK INC [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 2A,3 * * page 9 - page 12 *; | [A]EP1008862 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 5 * * column 3, line 7 - line 47 * * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 13 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 17 *; | [E]WO0212913 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1 * page 18, paragraph 82 * * page 21, paragraph 90 ** page 24, paragraph 99 *; | [A] - PARKINSON B W ET AL, GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM: THEORY AND APPLICATIONS, GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM: THEORY AND APPLICATIONS, PROGRESS IN ASTRONAUTICS AND AERONAUTICS VOL. 163, WASHINGTON, DC: AIAA, US, VOL. I, PAGE(S) 396-398, ISBN 1-56347-106-X, XP002254897 [A] 1 * Section 2. "Frame synchronisation", page 397 - page 398; figure 43 * |