EP1429030 - Multi-stage rotary compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 55, Hondori 2-Chome, Keihan Moriguchi-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd 55, Hondori 2-Chome, Keihan Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Kenzo 2105-3, Kokai Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-Ken / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Kazuaki 5335-208, Ryumai-machi Ota-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamasaki, Haruhisa H1-503, 986-5, Yoshida, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Watabe, Yoshio 12-8, Suzukake Ojima-machi Nitta-Gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 05 /
Yamaguchi, Kentaro 2-14-2B, Nishikoizumi, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 06 /
Tsuda, Noriyuki 5-5-25, Sakata Oizumi-machi Ora-Gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 07 /
Yamanaka, Masaji 1000-61, Takane-cho Tatebayashi-Shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 08 /
Sato, Kazuya 2-14-14-201, Nishikoizumi, Oizumi-machi Ora-Gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019199.3 | 25.08.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | JP20020247201 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002247201 | JP20020247204 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002247204 | JP20020250927 | 29.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002250927 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429030 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1429030 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/356, F04C23/00, F01C21/08, F04C29/10 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C18/344 (KR);
F04C23/001 (EP,US);
F01C21/0863 (EP,US);
F04C18/3564 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/25] | Title | German: | Mehrstufiger Rotationsverdichter | [2004/25] | English: | Multi-stage rotary compressor | [2004/25] | French: | Compresseur rotatif multi-étages | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 02.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | EP07009816.5 / EP1813815 | EP07009817.3 / EP1813816 | EP07009818.1 / EP1813817 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH02294586 ; | [XAY]JPH02294587 ; | [XA]JP2000283077 ; | [Y]JP2001132675 ; | [A]JP2002227789 ; | [PXL]JP2003184771 ; | [YA]JPH07229498 ; | [A]JPS5870089 ; | [A]US5242280 (FUJIO KATUHARU [JP]) [A] 1,5,6 * figures 2,3,11 *; | [YA]US5399076 (MATSUDA MIKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 10,11 * figures 22-25 * * column 15, line 33 - line 61 * * column 16, line 31 - line 31 * [A] 12; | [X]EP0811766 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 10 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 23 - line 35 * * column 10, line 22 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0935106 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 2-5 * figures 2,4 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 4 * * column 9, line 44 - line 51 * * column 10, line 10 - line 18 * * column 12, line 40 - line 46 * * column 13, line 5 - line 8 *; | [XA]EP1195526 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * column 9, line 26 - line 50 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 19 * * column 10, line 5 - line 29 * [A] 7-13; | [EL]EP1344938 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [EL] 1,10,11 * figures 1-3 * * column 7, line 21 - line 46 * * column 9, line 36 - line 47 * * column 11, line 42 - column 12, line 55 * * L: Priority * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910219), vol. 015, no. 069, Database accession no. (M - 1083), & JP02294586 A 19901205 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [A] 7-12 [Y] 3-6 | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910219), vol. 015, no. 069, Database accession no. (M - 1083), & JP02294587 A 19901205 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5,6 * [A] 3-9,12 [Y] 10,11,13 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000283077 A 20001010 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [A] 7-13 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001132675 A 20010518 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 3-6 * abstract * * figures 1,3-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021212), vol. 2002, no. 12, & JP2002227789 A 20020814 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 10-12 * abstract * * figures 5,7 * | [PXL] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003184771 A 20030703 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [PXL] 13 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * L: Priority * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07229498 A 19950829 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 13 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [A] 12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830716), vol. 007, no. 163, Database accession no. (M - 229), & JP58070089 A 19830426 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [A] 12,13 * abstract * * figures 3,5 * | Examination | JP2002098083 | EP1316730 |