EP1398154 - Active color control for a printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innolutions, Inc. 92 N. Main Street, Suite 15H Windsor, New Jersey 08561 / US | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedman, Michael 52 Church Street Windsor New Jersey 08561 / US | 02 /
Patel, Manojkumar 4 Wellesley Court Princeton Junction New Jersey 08550 / US | 03 /
Westberg, Bruce Apt. 6-D Colletti Terrace Jamesburg New Jersey 08831 / US | 04 /
Patel, Piyushkumar 87 Deacon Drive Hamilton New Jersey 08619 / US | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Zounek, Nikolai, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/29] | Zounek, Nikolai, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Zounek, Nikolai, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2004/12] | Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H 391, Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019533.3 | 01.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | US20020234304 | 03.09.2002 Original published format: US 234304 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1398154 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1398154 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
B41F33/0045 (EP,US);
B41P2233/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/12] | Title | German: | Aktive Farbkontrolle für eine Druckmaschine | [2004/12] | English: | Active color control for a printing press | [2004/12] | French: | Commande de couleur active dans une machine à imprimer | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 20.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5791249 (QUADRACCI THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1,3,5,7,9* the whole document *; | [A]US5992318 (DIBELLO DOMINICK J [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5543922 | US5724259 | US5967049 | US5967050 | US5992318 | US6058201 | US6318260 |