EP1376008 - Lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 - Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states C.R.F. Societa Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 - Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bigliati, Claudia Via Gramsci 15 13039 Trino (Vercelli) / IT | 02 /
Perlo, Piero Via Chichignolo 19 12048 Sommariva Bosco (Cueno) / IT | 03 /
Sinesi, Sabino Via Pietro Micca 14 10045 Piossasco (Torino) / IT | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Freyria Fava, Cristina Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Freyria Fava, Cristina Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria 18 I-10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03019736.2 | 30.04.2001 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | IT2000TO00407 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: IT TO20000407 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376008 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376008 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376008 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F21V13/04, F21V7/09, F21V7/00, // F21W101:08, F21W131:40, F21W131:10, F21Y101:00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
F21V7/09 (EP,US);
F21S8/00 (EP);
F21V13/04 (EP);
F21V5/002 (EP,US);
F21V7/0008 (EP);
F21W2106/00 (EP);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | F21V13/04, F21V7/09, // F21W101:08, F21W131:40, F21W131:10, F21Y101:00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/01] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungseinrichtung | [2004/01] | English: | Lighting device | [2004/01] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 02.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01830287.7 / EP1152187 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2005
ADMISSIBLE Siteco Beleuchtungstechnik GmbH Ohmstrasse 50 83301 Traunreut / DE Opponent's representative Schohe, Stefan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2005
ADMISSIBLE Siteco Beleuchtungstechnik GmbH Ohmstrasse 50 83301 Traunreut / DE Opponent's representative Schohe, Stefan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | 28.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.06.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/49] | 28.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.07.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.05.2009 | ES | 04.05.2009 | GB | 30.04.2012 | [2017/11] |
Former [2013/10] | SE | 01.05.2009 | |
ES | 04.05.2009 | ||
GB | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2011/31] | SE | 01.05.2009 | |
ES | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | IT | 30.04.2009 | |
ES | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | ES | 04.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB1021159 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 61 - line 66 * * page 1, line 77 - line 86 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE3702236 (STEINECKE WOLFHART [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 4, line 55 - line 64 * * page 5, line 19 - line 68 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0766037 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [DA] 1 * column 6, line 8 - line 24 ** figure 7 * |