EP1396916 - Protective hose for accommodating cables arranged inside an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2008/35] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borchers, Klaus-Hinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Dohrmannskamp 5 27446 Selsingen / DE | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/11] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019791.7 | 30.08.2003 | [2004/11] | Priority number, date | DE2002141573 | 07.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10241573 | [2004/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1396916 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1396916 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1396916 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H02G3/0487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | Schutzschlauch-Anordnung für innenverlegte Leitungen im Flugzeug | [2004/11] | English: | Protective hose for accommodating cables arranged inside an aircraft | [2004/11] | French: | Tuyau flexible de protection de câbles disposé à l'intérieur d'un aéronef | [2004/11] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IE | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | AT | 30.08.2008 | LU | 30.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
TR | 27.08.2008 | ||
AT | 30.08.2008 | ||
LU | 30.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 27.08.2008 | |
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
AT | 30.08.2008 | ||
LU | 30.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
AT | 30.08.2008 | ||
LU | 30.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
AT | 30.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 27.08.2008 | |
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 27.08.2008 | |
ES | 08.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1821234 (HOWARD PARKER) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 52 - column 1, line 55; figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 43 - column 2, line 88 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US4202520 (LOOS JOHN F [US], et al) [Y] 4* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 15; figure 4 *; | [XA]EP0382916 (VOGELSANG ERNST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-4 * [A] 9 |