EP1510631 - Skylight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTO FRANK AG Stuttgarter Strasse 145-149 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stempfhuber, Dirk Malvenweg 20 97947 Grünsfeld / DE | 02 /
Klöpfer, Hannes Nellenburgstrasse 11 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | 03 /
Bartmann, Ulrich Rote-Tor-Strasse 64 76661 Philippsburg / DE | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019818.8 | 30.08.2003 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510631 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510631 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/03 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
E04D13/031 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dachfenster | [2005/09] | English: | Skylight | [2005/09] | French: | Lucarne | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6195948 (LAMANNA ROCCO JOSEPH [CA]) [X] 1-3,7 * column 5, line 40 - column 8, line 41; figures 1-3,5,9,10 *[A] 4-6,8-12 | by applicant | EP1061198 |