EP1415750 - Welding apparatus with a hexagonal mounting receptable for a component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/19] | Mounting receptable for welding apparatus component | ||
[2006/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cigelske, James J., Jr. 334 Ahnaip Street Menasha Wisconsin 45952 / US | 02 /
Achtner, Richard M. 1531 Ames Street Neenah Wisconsin 45956 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg), Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019821.2 | 30.08.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US20020065572 | 31.10.2002 Original published format: US 65572 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415750 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1415750 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415750 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/32 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B23K9/323 (EP,US);
B23K9/1006 (EP,US);
H05K5/0213 (US);
H05K7/20181 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/38] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schweisseinrichtung mit einem hexagonalischen Zusammenbaubehälter für ein Komponent | [2006/51] | English: | Welding apparatus with a hexagonal mounting receptable for a component | [2006/51] | French: | Appareil de soudage avec un boîtier de montage hexagonal pour un composant | [2006/51] |
Former [2004/19] | Zusammenbaubehälter für eine Schweisseinrichtungskomponente | ||
Former [2004/19] | Mounting receptable for welding apparatus component | ||
Former [2004/19] | Boîtier de montage pour un composant d'appareil de soudage | Examination procedure | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0374918 (KNUDSEN NORDISK ELECT [DK]) [X] 11,15,16,18 * column 4, lines 5-31; figures 4,5 * [Y] 1,3-8,10,12,13; | [X]US5096439 (ARNETT JAIME R [US]) [X] 16,18 * column 4, lines 3-52; figures 2,3 *; | [A]BE1005933 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,11,16* the whole document *; | [A]EP0756353 (CLEARPLAS FRANCE SOCIETE ANONY [FR]) [A] 1,3-8,10-13,15,16,18 * column 1, lines 10-52; figure - *; | [Y]US5831240 (KATOOKA MASAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3-8,10,12,13 * column 5, lines 37-57 * * column 8, lines 39-43; figures 2,4,5 *; | [XA]US2002105230 (ZIEGLER WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 16,18 * paragraphs [0067] - [0069] - [0075]; figures 4a,5,7 * [A] 1,3-8,10-13,15 |