EP1403678 - Device for holding a camera behind a telescope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Sports Optics GmbH Gloelstrasse 3-5 35576 Wetzlar / DE | [2006/49] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Hensoldt AG Gloelstrasse 3-5 35576 Wetzlar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claudi, Volker Am Brühl 7 35633 Lahnau / DE | 02 /
Becker, Kurt, Dr. Robert-Bosch-Strasse 23 35440 Linden / DE | 03 /
Michel, Frank Nordstrasse 6 35619 Braunfels / DE | 04 /
Will, Peter Göthestrasse 6 35102 Lahra / DE | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Schultz, Jörg Martin, et al Carl Zeiss AG Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Schultz, Jörg Martin, et al Carl Zeiss AG Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Müller-Rissmann, Werner Albrecht, Dr. Carl Zeiss, Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03019962.4 | 03.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | DE2002144669 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10244669 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1403678 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1403678 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1403678 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/16 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
G03B17/48 (EP,US);
G02B23/16 (EP,US);
G03B17/561 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Halten einer Kamera hinter einem Fernglas | [2004/14] | English: | Device for holding a camera behind a telescope | [2004/14] | French: | Dispositif pour maintenir un appareil photographique a l'arriere d'une jumelle | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | IE | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | HU | 15.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 15.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2679197 (DE FRANCISCO MARSHALL S) [A] 1-17* column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 25 *; | [XA]US2937584 (GESUALDI FRANK C) [X] 5-7,15,17 * column 1, line 69 - column 4, line 9 * [A] 1-4,8-14; | [A]US3055283 (YOSHIAKI SUZUKI) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 28 *; | [XA]US4222646 (WEST ROBERT D) [X] 5,15 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 26 * [A] 6-14,16,17; | [Y]US5930036 (CLUFF KENNETH L [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 49 *; | [A]US5963748 (GLASSON MICHAEL J [GB]) [A] 1-4 * column 4, lines 1-54 *; | [Y]US2002114070 (BARZIZA SAMUEL W [US]) [Y] 1-4 * Absätze [0002] - [0006] und [0030] * |