EP1496288 - Torsional vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills MI 48326 / US | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. BorgWarner Powertrain Technical Center, Suite 100, 3800 Automation Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48236-1782 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kroll, Jürgen Ulmengasse 1 68775 Ketsch / DE | 02 /
Bastel, Norbert Thurn & Taxis Strasse 42 68794 Obernhausen / DE | 03 /
Ebner, Till Im Schöffenstuhl 20 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Neunert, Peter Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Neunert, Peter Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020332.7 | 09.09.2003 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | EP20030015283 | 07.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03015283 | [2005/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496288 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496288 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/131, F16F15/134 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F16F15/1343 (EP,US);
F16F15/30 (KR);
F16F15/13142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/39] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Torsionsschwingungsdämpfer | [2005/02] | English: | Torsional vibration damper | [2005/02] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations torsionelles | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3909892 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 3; figure 3 *; | [Y]FR2749634 (VALEO [FR]) [Y] 6-10 * abstract *; | [XY]DE19716487 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10; | [A]DE10005996 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 9,10* column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 23; figure 8 *; | [A]EP1174633 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]DE10037646 (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE4345542 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0014]; figure 2 *; | [E]EP1371875 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [E] 1,2,4,5 * figure 6 * |