EP1398327 - Method of producing hydroxyalkyl starch derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: NL | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Kabi Strategic Business Center 61346 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zander, Norbert Zellbergsheideweg 45 38527 Meine / DE | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Altmann, Andreas, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Altmann, Andreas, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Altmann, Andreas Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Wichmann, Hendrik Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/12] | Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr. Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020424.2 | 11.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | EP20020020425 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02020425 | US20020409781P | 11.09.2002 Original published format: US 409781 P | WO2003EP08829 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: PCT/EP0308/829 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1398327 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398327 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08B31/00, C07K14/505, A61K47/48 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
C08B31/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08B31/10 (KR);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61K9/0021 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07K14/505 (EP,US);
C07K14/53 (EP,US);
C07K14/5412 (EP,US);
C07K14/55 (EP,US);
C07K14/56 (EP,US);
C07K14/565 (EP,US);
C07K17/10 (EP,US);
C08B31/00 (EP,US);
C08B31/006 (EP,US);
C08B31/08 (EP,US);
C08B31/185 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxyalkylstärkederivaten | [2004/12] | English: | Method of producing hydroxyalkyl starch derivatives | [2004/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation des dérives d'amidon hydroxyalkyle | [2008/09] |
Former [2004/12] | procede de preparation des derives d'amidon hydroxyalkyle | Examination procedure | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 24.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08012908.3 / EP2017287 | EP10011836.3 / EP2272865 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.2009
04.06.2009
ADMISSIBLE AplaGen GmbH Arnold-Sommerfeld-Ring 2 52499 Baesweiler / DE Opponent's representative Roth, Carla, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.2009
AplaGen GmbH Arnold-Sommerfeld-Ring 2 52499 Baesweiler / DE Opponent's representative Roth, Carla, et al, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Lohengrinstraße 11 D-40549 Düsseldorf / DE | 01.07.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2012 | 23.03.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.04.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/32] | 20.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.08.2008 | LU | 11.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | [2015/36] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 27.08.2008 | |
LU | 11.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | LU | 11.09.2008 | |
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | MC | 30.09.2008 | |
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | MC | 30.09.2008 | |
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | MC | 30.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2616086 (FRESENIUS CHEM PHARM IND) [XD] 1-5,12,15-20,22-26,33,36-41,43 * example 1 *; | [X]DE3029307 (FRESENIUS CHEM PHARM IND [DE]) [X] 1-8,11-20,22-29,32-41,43,47 * example 1 *; | [X]US5543332 (LIHME ALLAN O F [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12,15-20,22-25,30,31,33,36-41,43 * examples 2,16 *; | [PXD]WO02080979 (FRESENIUS KABI DE GMBH [DE], et al) [PXD] 1-49* example 7 *; | [E]WO03074087 (BIOTECHNOLOGIE GES MITTELHESSE [DE], et al) [E] 1-14,16,19-49 * claim 1 *; | [X] - LARIONOVA N I ET AL, "CONJUGATION OF THE BOWMAN-BIRK SOYBEAN PROTEINASE INHIBITOR WITH HYDROXYETHYLSTARCH", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, CLIFTON, NJ, US, (1997), vol. 62, no. 2/3, ISSN 0273-2289, pages 175 - 182, XP001122297 [X] 1-4,12,15-20,22-25,33,36-41,43 * page 176 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02787993 | Examination | - THOMAS E. ET AL., CRIT CARE MED, (2000), vol. 28, pages 627 - 631 |