EP1396811 - Apparatus and method for reading and decoding optical codes with result indication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATALOGIC S.P.A. Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states DATALOGIC S.P.A. Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palestini, Valeria Via Turati 4 40012 Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
Alessi, Nicola Via Porrettana 89/2 43100 Bologna / IT | 03 /
Rigoni, Giacomo Via Matteotti 58 36012 Asiago (Vicenza) / IT | 04 /
Oliva, Cristiano Via Sandro Pertini 9 20064 Gorgonzola / IT | [2008/25] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
Palestini, Valeria Via Turati 4 40012 Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | ||
02 /
Alessi, Nicola Via Porrettana 89/2 43100 Bologna / IT | |||
03 /
Rigoni, Giacomo Via Matteotti 58 36012 Asiago (Vicenza) / IT | |||
04 /
Oliva, Christiano Via Sandro Pertini 9 20064 Gorgonzola / IT | |||
Former [2004/11] | 01 /
Palestini, Valeria Via Turati 4 40012 Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | ||
02 /
Alessi, Nicola Via Porrettana 89/2 43100 Bologna / IT | |||
03 /
Rigoni, Giacomo Via Monterumici 36/8 40133 Bologna / IT | |||
04 /
Oliva, Christiano Via Sandro Pertini 9 20064 Gorgonzola / IT | Representative(s) | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03020748.4 | 23.02.2000 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1396811 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1396811 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1396811 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1396811 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
G06K7/10722 (EP,US);
G06K7/10851 (EP,US);
G06K7/10861 (EP,US);
G06K7/10881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erfassen und Lesen optischer Codes mit Anzeige des Resultats | [2004/11] | English: | Apparatus and method for reading and decoding optical codes with result indication | [2004/11] | French: | Dispositif et méthode d'aquisition et de lecture d'un code optique avec indication du résultat | [2004/11] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 05.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00830127.7 / EP1128315 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Request for further processing for: | 30.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/42] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH08202806 ; | [A]US5140141 (INAGAKI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7,16,19 * column 3, lines 12-17 ** column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5992749 (SEO SHUZO [JP]) [A] 1,3,7,16,19,27 * figures 1,2,5-8 * * column 5, line 32 - line 58 * * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 65 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08202806 A 19960809 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [AD] 1-3,7,12,16,17,19,27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * * An automatic translation can be found on the IPDL website of the Japanese Patent Office * |