EP1402829 - Vertebra body plate for vertebral column fixing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa IKA Kohgyo Co., Ltd. 1-1, Hongo, Meito-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Showa IKA Kohgyo Co., Ltd. 1-1, Hongo, Meito-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Nobumasa 3-23-20, Kamikitazawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nohara, Yutaka 10-A-827, Gamoukotobukicho 2-chome Koshigaya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakahara, Shinnosuke 2-6-34, Tsushimaminami Okayama-shi Okayama-ken / JP | 04 /
Sato, Shigenobu 2-3-2, Fukuzumiichijou Toyohira-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 05 /
Ueyama, Kazumasa 3-8-4, Jousei Hirosaki-shi Aomori-ken / JP | 06 /
Hasegawa, Kazuhiro 1-23-604, Yayoi-cho Niigata-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 07 /
Oribe, Kazuya c/o Showa Ika Kohgyo Co.Ltd. 1-1, Hongo Meito-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 08 /
Takamido, Hiroshi c/o Showa Ika Kohgyo Co.Ltd. 1-1, Hongo Meito-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
Suzuki, Nobumasa 3-23-20, Kamikitazawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Nohara, Hiroshi 10-A-827, Gamoukotobukicho 2-chome Koshigaya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Nakahara, Shinnosuke 2-6-34, Tsushimaminami Okayama-shi Okayama-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Sato, Shigenobu 2-3-2,Fuzumiichijou Toyohira-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido / JP | |||
05 /
Ueyama, Kazumasa 3-8-4, Jousei Hirosaki-shi Aomori-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Hasegawa, Kazuhiro 1-23-604, Yayoi-cho Niigata-shi Niigata-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Oribe, Kazuya c/o Showa Ika Kohgyo Co.Ltd. 1-1, Hongo Meito-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Takamido, Hiroshi c/o Showa Ika Kohgyo Co.Ltd. 1-1, Hongo Meito-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020809.4 | 12.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | JP20020267300 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002267300 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1402829 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1402829 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/7059 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/08] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wirbelkörperplatte für ein Wirbelsäulenbefestigungssystem | [2004/14] | English: | Vertebra body plate for vertebral column fixing system | [2004/14] | French: | Plaque vertébrale pour un système de fixation de la colonne vertébrale | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5603714 (KANEDA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 5, lines 20-35; figures 2,4,13,19 * * column 6, lines 20-54 *; | [X]US5662652 (SCHAEFER BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 46-48; figures 1,5,9 * * column 8, lines 5-12 *; | [X]WO0103570 (WALL M D ERIC J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 1; figures 2,4,7,8 *; | [A]US6231610 (GEISLER FRED [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 26-29; figures 6,7 *; | [A]DE20104634U (ALLOCON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* page 12, lines 30-37; figure 2; claims 1,11-13 *; | [PX]FR2836371 (EUROSURGICAL [FR]) [PX] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A] - ZDEBLICK T A ET AL, "ANTERIOR SPINAL FIXATION AFTER LUMBAR CORPECTOMY. ÖA STUDY IN DOGS", JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY. BOSTON, US, (19910401), vol. 73-A, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9355, pages 527 - 534, XP000202596 [A] 1 * page 529, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 2 * |