EP1400958 - Hard disk drive having hole cover for blocking electromagnetic wave [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong Kwonsun-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Kwonsun-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Jae-deog Na-207 Hyowon Villa 873 Maetan 3-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Chul-wo 103-604 Park Town Daerim Apt., 51 Soonae-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Kwang-kyu 114-301 Woonam Apt. 489 Gokbangjeong-dong Kwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03020966.2 | 16.09.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | KR20020056231 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: KR 2002056231 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1400958 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1400958 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B5/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
G11B33/121 (EP,US);
G11B33/12 (KR);
G11B25/043 (EP,US);
G11B33/1493 (EP,US);
G11B5/012 (EP,US);
G11B5/11 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/13] | G11B7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2007/05] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Festplattenlaufwerk mit Lochbedeckung für die Blockierung von elektromagnetischer Welle | [2004/13] | English: | Hard disk drive having hole cover for blocking electromagnetic wave | [2004/13] | French: | Unité de disque dur avec une couverture de trou pour bloquer d' onde electromagnetique | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/41] | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06105612 ; | [A]JPS60111318 ; | [A]JPH01155510 ; | [A]US6104574 (TAKANO HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940715), vol. 018, no. 377, Database accession no. (C - 1225), & JP06105612 A 19940419 (ISEKI & CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851019), vol. 009, no. 262, Database accession no. (P - 398), & JP60111318 A 19850617 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890921), vol. 013, no. 424, Database accession no. (P - 934), & JP01155510 A 19890619 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |