EP1400830 - Microscope system and method for multiple observers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Surgical GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2006/02] |
Former [2005/49] | For:CH
DE
FR
Carl Zeiss Surgical GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | ||
Former [2004/31] | For:CH
DE
FR
Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | |||
Former [2004/13] | For:CH
DE
FR
Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung, trading as Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermann, Karlheinz Weilerstrasse 88 73434 Aalen / DE | 02 /
Rudolph, Frank Böhmerwaldstrasse 33 73431 Aalen / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Martin Buchenweg 5 89551 Königsbronn / DE | 04 /
Steffen, Joachim, Dr. Donauschwabenstrasse 9 73463 Westhausen / DE | 05 /
Wirth, Michael Hasenweg 25 73434 Aalen / DE | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021030.6 | 17.09.2003 | [2004/13] | Priority number, date | DE20021043852 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243852 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1400830 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1400830 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1400830 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/18, G02B21/22, G02B21/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G02B21/18 (EP,US);
G02B21/0012 (EP,US);
G02B21/22 (EP,US);
G02B21/367 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/13] | G02B21/18 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2005/04] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikroskopiesystem und Mikroskopieverfahren für mehrere Beobachter | [2004/13] | English: | Microscope system and method for multiple observers | [2004/13] | French: | Système et méthode de microscopie pour plusieurs observateurs | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4134481 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]); | [XA]WO9620421 (LEICA AG [CH], et al); | [X]WO9813716 (LEICA INC [US], et al); | [A]WO0068724 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [CH], et al); | [A]WO0127659 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [CH], et al); | [DA]US6327079 (NAMII YASUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2001050808 (MORITA KAZUO [JP], et al); | [A]EP1235094 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [CH]); | [PA]US2003112509 (TAKAHASHI SUSUMU [JP]) |