EP1372340 - Method and apparatus for dynamic contrast improvement in video pictures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2006/50] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akbayir, Sahmusa Neubrunnenring 24 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Schäferjohann, Volker Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Schäferjohann, Volker Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2003/51] | Schäferjohann, Volker Willi Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021074.4 | 21.05.1999 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | EP19980109976 | 02.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98109976 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1372340 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1372340 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372340 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/57 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H04N5/57 (EP);
H04N5/20 (EP);
H04N21/4854 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur dynamischen Kontrastverbesserung in Videobildern | [2003/51] | English: | Method and apparatus for dynamic contrast improvement in video pictures | [2003/51] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'amélioration dynamique du contraste dans des images vidéo | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99109999.5 / EP0963112 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4057828 (MONAHAN JOHN F) [A] 3,10 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0390179 (ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0512341 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 4,11* abstract * |