EP1405623 - Package for suppositories combined with a lubricant agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANLIKER, Markus Auf dem Aurain 55 73340 Amstetten / DE | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states ANLIKER, Markus Wasserstapfe 6 b 88499 Riedlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Thorsten Meyer Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrer-Schultes-Weg 14 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Meyer, Thorsten Patentanwaltskanzlei Meyer Pfarrer-Schultes-Weg 14 D-89077 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021389.6 | 22.09.2003 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | DE2002146003 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10246003 | [2004/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405623 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405623 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/08, B65D75/34 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
A61J3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | Suppositorienverpackung, die mit einem Gleitmittel kombiniert ist | [2004/15] | English: | Package for suppositories combined with a lubricant agent | [2004/15] | French: | Emballage pour suppositoires combiné avec un agent lubrifiant | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.10.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   10.11.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2006 | 30.09.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IE | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | LU | 22.09.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/42] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2747574 (DE LORENZO JOSEPH P) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 15 - line 21 * * column 2, line 9 - line 25; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US3667465 (VOSS JOSEPH A) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, line 43 - line 47 * * column 4, line 31 - line 35; figure 2 *; | [X]US6375956 (HERMELIN MARC S [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 11, line 25 - line 33 ** column 15, paragraph L; figure 2 * |