EP1372323 - Mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christal, Philip Tulpenweg 6 85646 Anzig / DE | [2003/51] | Application number, filing date | 03021398.7 | 01.12.1994 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | DE19934343295 | 17.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4343295 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372323 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372323 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72, H04M1/725 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/72466 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2003/51] | Title | German: | Mobiltelefon | [2003/51] | English: | Mobile telephone | [2003/51] | French: | Téléphone mobile | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94118962.3 / EP0659004 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01114220 ; | [A]US4982424 (SAITO AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0494525 (TECHNOPHONE LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 8, line 43; figures 1-5 *; | [PX]DE4233066 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890808), vol. 013, no. 354, Database accession no. (E - 802), & JP01114220 A 19890502 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - WAGENLEHNER, "BEDIENUNG DES MODERNEN MOBILTELEFONS - EINFACH UND LOGISCH", TELCOM REPORT, MÜNCHEN, (198703), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 99 - 101, XP000858611 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [PX] - CHRISTAL, "GSM-HANDY MIT TOP-HANDLING", TELCOM REPORT, MÜNCHEN, (199401), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 332 - 335, XP000425543 [PX] 1,2 * the whole document * |