EP1406236 - Driving method and apparatus of plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Byung Soo Gunyoung Billa 507-201 Daewha-dong Sungjumaoel Ilsan-gu Goyang-si Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Myoung, Dae Jin 16th Bunji Woomyun-dong 137-724 Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
Song, Byung Soo Gunyoung Billa 507-201 Daewha-dong Sungjumaoel Ilsan-gu Goyang-si Kyungki-do / KR | ||
02 /
Myoung, Dae Jin 216 Gwansan-dong Dukyang-gu Goyang-si Kyungki-do / KR | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg), Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021930.7 | 29.09.2003 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | KR20020060040 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: KR 2002060040 | KR20030013371 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003013371 | KR20030013369 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003013369 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1406236 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1406236 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G09G3/2051 (EP,US);
G09G3/2022 (EP,US);
G09G3/2059 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0261 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0266 (EP,US);
G09G2320/106 (EP,US);
G09G3/298 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2007/07] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ansteuerung einer Plasma-Anzeigetafel | [2004/15] | English: | Driving method and apparatus of plasma display panel | [2004/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande d'un panneau d'affichage à plasma | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 05.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0893916 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract ** column 7, line 5 - column 16, line 58; figures 1-13 *; | [X]FR2814627 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 10, line 5; figures 1-8 * |