EP1403734 - Developer supply container for a process cartridge of an electrophotographic image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Akiyoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Numagami, Atsushi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ueno, Takahito Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03021943.0 | 29.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | JP20020285582 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002285582 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403734 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
G03G15/0886 (EP,US);
G03G15/08 (KR);
G03G15/0855 (EP,US);
G03G15/0865 (EP,US);
G03G15/0875 (EP,US);
G03G15/0877 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0692 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0838 (EP,US);
G03G2215/085 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/52] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entwicklerzufuhrbehälter für eine Arbeitseinheit eines elektrophotographischen Bilderzeugungsgeräts | [2004/14] | English: | Developer supply container for a process cartridge of an electrophotographic image forming apparatus | [2004/14] | French: | Réservoir d'alimentation en développateur pour une unité de traitement d'un appareil électrophotographique de formation d'images | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP11173903.3 / EP2390728 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6324370 (ISOBE HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 12, line 5 - column 13, line 2 ** figures 1,6,10,11,30,31 *; | [X]EP1184742 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 16, line 44 - column 29, line 53 * * figures 1-3,5-13 * | Examination | EP0984341 | by applicant | US2324370 | EP1184742 |