EP1411095 - Use of hydroxyalkylphenon-type photoinitiators in irradiation curable organopolysiloxane compositions and antiadherent coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goldschmidt GmbH Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [2005/12] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brand, Mike Zollstrasse 140 45356 Essen / DE | 02 /
Döhler, Hardi Pannhütter Strasse 18 45525 Hattingen / DE | 03 /
Hamann, Winfried, Dr. Weidkamp 223 45356 Essen / DE | 04 /
Pomorin, Jürgen Auf der Horst 11 45309 Essen / DE | [2004/17] | Application number, filing date | 03022074.3 | 02.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | DE2002148111 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10248111 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411095 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1411095 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1411095 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/06, C08K5/07 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
C09D183/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/07 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, GB, IT [2005/22] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von Photoinitiatoren vom Typ Hydroxyalkylphenon in strahlenhärtbaren Organopolysiloxanen für die Herstellung von abhäsiven Beschichtungen | [2004/17] | English: | Use of hydroxyalkylphenon-type photoinitiators in irradiation curable organopolysiloxane compositions and antiadherent coatings | [2004/17] | French: | Application de photoinitiateurs du type hydroxyalkylphenone dans des compositions d'organopolysiloxanes durcissables par irradiation et revêtements antiadhérents | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 14.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 26.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4347111 (GEHLHAUS JUERGEN, et al) [X] 1-7 * column 6, line 28 - line 39; claims 1-21 * * column 6, line 58 - line 65 * * column 7, line 4 - line 9 *; | [X]US4721734 (GEHLHAUS JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * claims 1-11 * * column 7, line 61 - line 68 * * column 8, line 7 - line 12 *; | [A]EP0780712 (BORDEN INC [US]) [A] 1* claims 1,6-9,13,18-21 * |