EP1431573 - Circuit for noise suppression in a ignition system of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Alfredo Helgoländer Strasse 12a 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 02 /
Nohtse, Christoph Gartenstrasse 16 38173 Veltheim Ohe / DE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022144.4 | 30.09.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002160321 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10260321 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431573 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02P3/055 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F02P3/0552 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Funkentstörung einer Kraftfahrzeugzündanlage | [2004/26] | English: | Circuit for noise suppression in a ignition system of a vehicle | [2004/26] | French: | Circuit pour la suppression de bruit en un système d'allumage de véhicule à moteur | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/42] | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.02.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.02.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3902471 (BRUNGSBERG HEINRICH-JOSEF) [X] 1-8 * column 4, lines 3-9; figure 1 * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]US4556040 (HEYKE KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 5,6* figure - *; | [A]US4653460 (OOYABU SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,1A; claims 1,2 *; | [XY]US5577485 (LINDSLEY NATHANIEL L [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, lines 56-58; figure 6 * [Y] 1-6; | [YD]EP1217206 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [YD] 5,6 * paragraphs [0128] - [0130]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002145843 (PARADA AIDA I [MX], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0014]; figure 2 * |