EP1407941 - Occupant labeling for airbag-related applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farmer, Michael E. 5119 Lake Bluff Road West Bloomfield Oakland Michigan 48323 / US | 02 /
Slicker, James M. 7344 Hardisty West Bloomfield Oakland Michigan 48324-3628 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022290.5 | 02.10.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | US20020269308 | 11.10.2002 Original published format: US 269308 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1407941 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/01 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
B60R21/01542 (EP,US);
B60R21/16 (KR);
B60R21/01538 (EP,US);
B60R21/01552 (EP,US);
B60R21/01556 (EP,US);
B60R21/01558 (EP,US);
G06F18/24765 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/174 (EP,US);
G06T7/215 (EP,US);
G06T7/254 (EP,US);
G06T7/277 (EP,US);
G06T7/74 (EP,US);
G06V10/765 (EP,US);
G06V20/59 (EP,US);
G06V40/10 (EP,US);
G06V40/103 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0044 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01315 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30268 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Insassenmarkierung für Airbag-bezogene Anwendungen | [2004/16] | English: | Occupant labeling for airbag-related applications | [2004/16] | French: | Etiquetage d'occupant pour applications liées aux airbags | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/44] | 14.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |