EP1521361 - Modular amplifier arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Network Systems GmbH Thurn-und-Taxis-Strasse 10 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doubrava, Michael Schwanhaeusserstr. 13 90408 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Georg, Dr. Aeussere Grossweidenmuehlstr. 37 90419 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Blumbach Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022325.9 | 04.10.2003 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1521361 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/60, H03F1/02 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H03F3/602 (EP);
H03F1/0277 (EP);
H03F2200/198 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/52] |
Former [2005/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modulare Verstärkeranordnung | [2005/14] | English: | Modular amplifier arrangement | [2005/14] | French: | Dispositif d'amplification modulaire | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 07.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4893093 (CRONAUER EDWARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 19 - column 4, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4965530 (KATZ ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 4, line 53 - column 7, line 24; figure 3 *; | [A]US5543751 (STEDMAN ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-16* column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003107453 (KENINGTON PETER [GB]) [X] 1-16 * page 1, column L, line 36 - page 2, column R, line 27; figure 1 * |