EP1522573 - Cleaning Composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerochemica GmbH Hooghe Weg 35 47906 Kempen / DE | [2005/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deppe, Marc Weselerstr. 71 47661 Issum / DE | 02 /
Bruder, Gregor Dr. Nellenkath 1 47608 Geldern / DE | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Schreiber, Christoph, Dr., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022345.7 | 04.10.2003 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522573 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/50 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
C11D7/261 (EP);
C11D7/5022 (EP);
C11D7/263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/01] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel | [2005/15] | English: | Cleaning Composition | [2005/15] | French: | Composition de Nettoyage | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.11.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5269958 (DE JAGER JAN [NL]) [X] 1-9 * column 8, lines 35-37; example - * * column 6, lines 56-58 * * column 5, lines 54-65 *; | [A]US5723509 (WERNER JOACHIM [US], et al) [A] 1-9* column 2, lines 49-50; claim - *; | [X]WO0228992 (MOTSENBOCKER GREGG [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 23, lines 2-5; example -; claim - * * page 29, lines 19-28 * * page 33, lines 16-20 * * page 37, lines 1-5 * |