EP1462488 - Solvent systems for ink-jet inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2009/49] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhlir-Tsang, Linda C. 515 NW Elizabeth Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Beccarelli, Sandra Béatrice Yvonne, et al IP Section Hewlett-Packard Limited Long Down Avenue Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Beccarelli, Sandra Béatrice Yvonne, et al IP Section Hewlett-Packard Limited Lond Down Avenue Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022528.8 | 02.10.2003 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | US20030400131 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: US 400131 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462488 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462488 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lösungsmittelsysteme für Tintenstrahldrucktinten | [2004/40] | English: | Solvent systems for ink-jet inks | [2004/40] | French: | Systèmes de solvant pour encres pour jet d'encre | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5389132 (DAVULCU AKIN H [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * column 3, lines 32-38 * * column 3, lines 58-61 * * column 4, lines 30-34 * * column 4, lines 48-52 *; | [A]EP1029903 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-7,9,10* paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0022] , [0036] *; | [X]US2002025994 (ISHIZUKA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0016] , [0216] , [0242] - [0244] * | by applicant | US5389132 | EP1029903 | US2002025994 |