EP1395078 - Mobile communication system and method with fast and slow control traffic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XIRCOM Wireless, Inc. 1365 Garden of the Gods Road Colorado Springs Colorado 80907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states XIRCOM Wireless, Inc. 1365 Garden of the Gods Road Colorado Springs, Colorado 80907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Gary B. 4535 North Lake Boulevard Camelian Bay, CA 95771 / US | 02 /
Gavette, Sherman 1425 Timber Valley Road Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | 03 /
Hetherington, William D. 2510 Wimbleton Court Colorado Springs, CO 80920 / US | 04 /
Lindsay, Charles L. 18379 Lazy Summer Way Monument, CO 80132 / US | 05 /
Jensen, Ryan N. 4510 Sleepy Hollow Circle Colorado Springs, CO 80917 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03022773.0 | 20.09.1996 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | US19950532466 | 22.09.1995 Original published format: US 532466 | US19960610193 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: US 610193 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1395078 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1395078 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
G10L19/012 (EP,US);
H04B7/2618 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04L47/50 (EP,US);
H04L47/522 (EP,US);
H04L47/6215 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04W52/04 (EP,US);
H04W52/08 (EP,US);
H04W52/36 (EP,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04B7/0805 (EP,US);
H04B7/10 (EP,US);
H04B7/2668 (EP,US);
H04L1/1838 (EP,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/10] | Title | German: | Mobilkommunikationssystem und Verfahren mit schnellen und langsamen Steuerungsverkehr | [2004/10] | English: | Mobile communication system and method with fast and slow control traffic | [2004/10] | French: | Système et procédé de communication mobile à trafic de commande rapide et lente | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 17.10.2005 | New documents discovered [N /P] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96933857.3 / EP0873641 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0650304 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11,13,14* page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 3 *; | [X]US5420864 (DAHLIN JAN ERIK AAKE ST [SE], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 4, line 48 - line 55; figures 3,5 * |