EP1408161 - Concrete building block for retaining walls with geogrid retention [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herold, Andreas Auf dem Steinberge 10 99425 Weimar-Taubach / DE | [2006/48] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Herold, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Pabststrasse 12 99423 Weimar / DE | ||
For all designated states Preissler, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Friedensgasse 3 99423 Weimar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Liedtke, Klaus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10-11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Liedtke, Klaus Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 10 99096 Erfurt / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | Liedtke, Klaus, Dr. Postfach 10 19 16 99019 Erfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 03022793.8 | 11.10.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | DE2002215715U | 12.10.2002 Original published format: DE 20215715 U | [2004/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1408161 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1408161 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408161 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
E02D29/0241 (EP);
E02D2300/0084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/16] | Title | German: | Fertigteil aus Beton für Stützwände mit Geogitterrückverhängung | [2004/16] | English: | Concrete building block for retaining walls with geogrid retention | [2004/16] | French: | Bloc de construction en béton pour un mur de soutènement avec une géogrille de rétention | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IE | 15.12.2010 | IT | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6336773 (ANDERSON PETER L [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-16 * column 4, line 24 - column 21, line 51; figures 1,2,17,25 *; | [XP]US2003118410 (RACE ROBERT J [US]) [XP] 1-7,10-16* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1,11,14 * | by applicant | US2003118410 |