EP1380582 - FSH mimetics for the treatment of infertility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. Pietermaai 15 Curaçao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. Pietermaai 15 Curacao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El Tayer, Nabil 143 Gerald Road Milton, MA 02186 / US | 02 /
Magar, Sharad 20 Harrison Road Caton, MA 02021 / US | 03 /
Reddy, Adulla 32 Bubbling Brook Road 02081 Walpole, MA / US | 04 /
Buckler, David 11 Conifer Drive Mendham, NJ 07945 / US | [2004/18] |
Former [2004/03] | 01 /
El Tayer, Nabil 143 Gerald Road Milton, MA 02186 / US | ||
02 /
Magar, Sharad 20 Harrison Road Caton, MA 02021 / US | |||
03 /
Reddy, Adulla 2702 Village Road West Norwood, MA 02062 / US | |||
04 /
Buckler, David 11 Conifer Drive Mendham, NJ 07945 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023514.7 | 05.08.1999 | [2005/46] | Priority number, date | US19980095712P | 07.08.1998 Original published format: US 95712 P | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380582 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380582 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/445, A61K31/40, C07D405/14, C07D405/12, C07K5/06, C07D471/04, A61P5/24 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
C07K5/06078 (EP);
C07K5/06139 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/03] | Title | German: | FSH Mimetika zur Behandlung von Infertilität | [2004/03] | English: | FSH mimetics for the treatment of infertility | [2004/03] | French: | Analogues de l'hormone de stimulation des follicules por traiter l'infertilité | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99939686.4 / EP1102763 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 14.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5071836 (KOLAR CENEK [DE], et al) [A] 1,19* column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 25 * |