EP1410942 - Method for controlling an electric motor, electric motor driven vehicle, and method of gathering data of such a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2009/15] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Tomohiro c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Terada, Junji c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Kurosawa, Atsushi c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Yagi, Hiroaki c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Sasaki, Koushi c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023522.0 | 15.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | JP20020301055 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002301055 | JP20020316426 | 30.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002316426 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1410942 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1410942 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1410942 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/02, B60L15/20 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
B60L15/2045 (EP,US);
B60L15/025 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung eines elektrischen Motors, elektromotorisch angetriebenes Fahrzeug und Verfahren, um Daten eines solchen Fahrzeugs einzusammeln | [2004/17] | English: | Method for controlling an electric motor, electric motor driven vehicle, and method of gathering data of such a vehicle | [2004/17] | French: | Méthode de régulation d'un moteur électrique, véhiclule entraîné d'un moteur électrique et méthode pour collecter des dates d'un tel véhicule | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | BE | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | RO | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | HU | 09.10.2009 | IE | 15.10.2009 | LU | 15.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
HU | 09.10.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
LU | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
LU | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 15.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | SI | 08.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0731361 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 11,12 * page 3, line 1 - line 6 ** page 3, line 49 - line 53; claims 5,6 *; | [XY]EP1124322 (ECOSTAR ELECTRIC DRIVE SYSTEMS LLC [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] * [Y] 2-5,7-10; | [YA]US6329781 (MATSUI HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,8 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 15; figures 1-3,7 * * column 8, line 39 - column 8, line 41 * [A] 5,10; | [X]DE10146376 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 11,12 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US6404097 (PULLEN KEITH ROBERT [GB]) [Y] 4,9 * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 15 * * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 2, line 36 *; | [Y]EP1247687 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035]; claim 6 * | by applicant | JPH06133408 | EP1124322 |