EP1411291 - Vehicle lamp with light emitting diodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 144-0022 / JP | [2011/16] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 144-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Kiyohiro, c/o Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant, 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 259-1192 / JP | [2010/50] |
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
Akiyama, Kiyohiro, Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 259-1192 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023600.4 | 16.10.2003 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | JP20020304971 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002304971 | JP20030306253 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003306253 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411291 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1411291 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1411291 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, F21V7/06, F21V7/00, // F21Y101/02 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
B60Q1/2607 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21S43/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | F21S8/10, F21V7/06, F21Y101/02, F21V7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/46] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugleuchte mit Leuchtdioden | [2004/17] | English: | Vehicle lamp with light emitting diodes | [2004/17] | French: | Feu de véhicule avec diodes électroluminescentes | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10013565.6 / EP2327925 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19538645 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 4 - line 18 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 9; figure 3 *; | [A]US5642933 (HITORA SHOZO [JP]) [A] 1,9* column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 37; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0830984 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 2,10 * column 4, line 48 - line 55; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0974485 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021]; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]EP1094271 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0024] , [0030] , [0035]; figures 1c,3b,7c,7d * [Y] 1,10 |