EP1426019 - Muffle system for dental furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2009/51] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Firma Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foser, Hanspeter Stötz 15 9496 Balzers / LI | 02 /
Stampfer, Thomas Böschenmadstrasse 3 6806 Tosters / AT | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023686.3 | 17.10.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | DE2002157208 | 06.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10257208 | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426019 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1426019 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426019 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/20 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F27B5/10 (EP,US);
A61C13/20 (EP,US);
F27B17/025 (EP,US);
Y10S164/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | Muffelsystem für Dentalofen | [2004/24] | English: | Muffle system for dental furnace | [2004/24] | French: | Système à moufle pour four dentaire | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IE | 16.12.2009 | NL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | ES | 27.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | EE | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SI | 16.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5406999 (BERGER ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1,3* the whole document *; | [A]DE10037352 (ZUBLER GERAETEBAU [DE]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US6484791 (VIDAL PATRICIA E [US]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19844136 |