EP1414048 - Wiring harness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugaya, Masahiko Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Kuribayashi, Nobukazu Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03023847.1 | 20.10.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | JP20020305865 | 21.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002305865 | JP20020361735 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002361735 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414048 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414048 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/08, H01B7/00, H01R12/08, H01R13/66 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
H01R12/675 (EP,US);
H01R12/00 (US);
H01B7/0823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/03] |
Former [2004/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabelbaum | [2004/18] | English: | Wiring harness | [2004/18] | French: | Faisceau de câbles | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002208325 ; | [A]CH389056 (BURNDY CORP [US]) [A] 3 * page 3, line 35 - line 43; figure 4 *; | [Y]US3848946 (HALLEY D, et al) [Y] 3,4,10,11 * figures 1,3,5-9 *; | [A]FR2431202 (RAYCHEM GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,10 * page 2, line 10 - line 17; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP0283119 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 3,10 * figures 1,3 *; | [XY]US5064382 (MINNIS ALAN J [GB]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,10,11; | [A]US5324203 (SANO YUKIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,10 * column 5, line 53 - line 62; figures 2,12 *; | [A]US5344332 (LOPEZ ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 4* figures 1-4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021106), vol. 2002, no. 11, & JP2002208325 A 20020726 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK;SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD; SUMITOMO E) [X] 1 * abstract * |