EP1427180 - Network system for billing for use of document processing apparatuses, server apparatus, and network management program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic System Networks Co., Ltd. 1-62, Minoshima 4-chome Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8531 / JP | [2010/16] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Panasonic Communications Co., Ltd. 3-8, Shimo-Meguro, 2-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Isao No. 407, 9-9, Higashishukugou 3-chome Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi 321-0953 / JP | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2010/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03024368.7 | 24.10.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | JP20020309463 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002309463 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1427180 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1427180 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/34, H04N1/00, G03G21/02 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G03G15/5083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/24] | H04N1/34, H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/19] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzwerksystem zur Abrechnung der Verwendung von Dokumentverarbeitungsgeräten, Servergerät und Netzwerkverwaltungsprogramm | [2004/24] | English: | Network system for billing for use of document processing apparatuses, server apparatus, and network management program | [2004/24] | French: | Système de réseau pour la facturation de l'utilisation des appareils de traitement de documents, serveur et logiciel de gestion de réseau | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 19.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 27.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/11] | 28.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0478347 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 5,7,8,10,17,19,20,29,31,32* the whole document *; | [Y]US5956487 (VENKATRAMAN CHANDRASEKAR [US], et al) [Y] 1-12,14-21,23,26,33,35,36 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6216113 (AIKENS ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * the whole document * [Y] 1-12,14-21,23,26,33,35,36; | [Y]US2002087470 (HAYES KATHERINE E [US], et al) [Y] 2,5,8-11,14,17,20,21,23,29,31,32 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2002167684 (KIKUCHI KOJI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-36 * the whole document * |