EP1417985 - Electrical stimulation device particularly for neuromuscular stimulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globus Italia S.r.l. Via Vittorio Veneto, 36 31013 Codogne' (Prov. of Treviso) / IT | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertocco, Rossano Via Lago di Garda, 6 30030 Oriago Di Mira (Venezia) / IT | 02 /
Lucchetta, Pierpaolo Via San Felice, 4 31020 San Vendemiano (Treviso) / IT | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano & Associati, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03024504.7 | 24.10.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | IT2002TV00134 | 08.11.2002 Original published format: IT TV20020134 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417985 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | Elektrische Stimulationseinrichtung insbesondere zur neuromuskulären Stimulation | [2004/20] | English: | Electrical stimulation device particularly for neuromuscular stimulation | [2004/20] | French: | Stimulateur électrique en particulier pour la stimulation neuromusculaire | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4528984 (MORAWETZ PETER L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 30 - line 57 *; | [X]US5285781 (BRODARD ROLAND [CH]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular; column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 59; figures 1A,1B * * column 10, line 38 - line 58 * * column 11, line 16 - line 28 * * column 12, line 46 - line 53; claim 14 * |