EP1415836 - Openable roof with roller blind [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto Vehicle Systems International GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albert, Jean-Paul 1 Chemin du Bordage 79700 St. Pierre des Echaubrognes / FR | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Bedenbecker, Markus Feldstrasse 22 82131 Gauting / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Bedenbecker, Markus Untertaxetweg 88 82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 03024716.7 | 28.10.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | FR20020013449 | 28.10.2002 Original published format: FR 0213449 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415836 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B60J7/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2005/04] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Öffnungsfähige Dachvorrichtung mit Verdunkelungsrollo | [2004/19] | English: | Openable roof with roller blind | [2004/19] | French: | Toit ouvrant avec un store à enrouleur | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2923904 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W) [X] 1,2,4,9 * figure - * * pages 3-5 *; | [X]DE3338372 (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0195137 (VERMEULEN HOLLANDIA OCTROOIEN [NL]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * pages 1-3 *; | [A]EP0381066 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE19534288 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 14 * * abstract * |