EP1416440 - Apparatus and methods for improving detection of watermarks in content that has undergone a lossy transformation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaSec Technologies GmbH Berliner Platz 6-8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Mediasec Technologies GmbH Berliner Platz 6-8 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Jian 130 New Road Rumford, RI 02916 / US | 02 /
Picard, Justin 16 Mayflower Street Providence, RI 02906 / US | 03 /
Thorwirth, Niels 549 Hope Street, 2 Providence, RI 02906 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Rösler, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys. Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei, Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03025352.0 | 04.11.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US20020287206 | 04.11.2002 Original published format: US 287206 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1416440 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1416440 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G06T7/00 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G06T1/0028 (EP,US);
G06T1/005 (EP,US);
G07D7/0032 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0065 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Methoden zur verbesserten Detektion von Wasserzeichen in Inhalten nach verlustbehafteter Transformation | [2004/19] | English: | Apparatus and methods for improving detection of watermarks in content that has undergone a lossy transformation | [2004/19] | French: | Dispositif et méthodes pour la détection améliorée de marques de tatouage dans des données ayant subi une transformée avec perte | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2011 | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/51] | 12.08.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 07.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5414258 (LIANG LOUIS H [US]) [A] 55-61 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 38 * * column 7, lines 19-24 *; | [A]US2001054644 (LIANG LOUIS H [US]) [A] 55-61 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0007] *; | [X]US6385329 (SHARMA RAVI K [US], et al) [X] 32-54 * abstract * * column 1, lines 14-67 * * column 5, lines 31-50 * * column 10, lines 37-48 * * column 11, lines 19-32 * * column 15, lines 30-51 * * column 20, lines 30-43 * * column 21, lines 6-20 * * column 26, lines 11-41 *; | [X]US2002076083 (LEVY KENNETH L [US]) [X] 25-28,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0014] , [0024] *; | [X]US2002118871 (JONES JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 55-61 * abstract * * paragraphs [0180] , [0229] , [0250] - [0263] *; | [X]US6449377 (RHOADS GEOFFREY B [US]) [X] 55-57,60 * column 3, lines 41-58 * * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 15 * * column 16, line 15 - column 18, line 3 *; | [X]US2002157005 (BRUNK HUGH L [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-17,21-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] - [0072] , [0086] - [0092] *; | [Y]WO02087221 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 29 * page 1, columns 11-29 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 2 *; | [DX] - ZHAO J, "LOOK, IT'S NOT THERE", BYTE, MCGRAW-HILL INC. ST PETERBOROUGH, US, (1997), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0360-5280, pages 7 - 8,10,12, XP000199953 [DX] 1,2,11-15,21 * pages 7,8,10 * | [X] - CROSS D ET AL, "Watermarking for self-authentication of compressed video", PROCEEDINGS 2002 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2002. ROCHESTER, NY, SEPT. 22 - 25, 2002, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020922), VOL. 2 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7622-6, pages 913 - 916, XP010608121 [X] 18-20 * page II-914, left-hand column, lines 11 - 43; figure 1 * | [X] - HUA ZHONG ET AL, "A new fragile watermarking technique for image authentication", SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2002 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUG. 26-30, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020826), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7488-6, pages 792 - 795, XP010628107 [X] 18,19 * abstract * * section "2.1 Problem analysis" * | [XY] - LANCINI R ET AL, "A robust video watermarking technique for compression and transcoding processing", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2002. ICME '02. PROCEEDINGS. 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND 26-29 AUG. 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20020826), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7304-9, pages 549 - 552, XP010604427 [X] 25-28,30,31 * abstract * * sections "2.1. Mask construction", "2.3. Watermark insertion" * [Y] 29 | [X] - BANGALEEA R ET AL, "Performance improvement of spread spectrum spatial domain watermarking scheme through diversity and attack characterisation", 2002 IEEE AFRICON 6TH. AFRICON CONFERENCE IN AFRICA. UNIVERSITY OF PRETORIA, GEORGE, SOUTH AFRICA, OCT. 2 - 4, 2002, IEEE AFRICON CONFERENCE IN AFRICA, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021002), VOL. 1 OF 2. CONF. 6, ISBN 0-7803-7570-X, pages 293 - 298, XP010621691 [X] 25-27,30 * abstract * * sections "1. Introduction", "2.2 Watermark Embedding" * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AFRCON.2002.1146851 | [X] - LANCINI R ET AL, "A robust video watermarking technique in the spatial domain", VIDEO/IMAGE PROCESSING AND MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS 4TH EURASIP-IEEE REGION 8 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON VIPROMCOM JUN. 16-19, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020616), ISBN 953-7044-01-7, pages 251 - 256, XP010598723 [X] 32-35,39-44,48,49 * abstract * * sections "1. Introduction", "2.1. Mask construction", "2.3. Synchronization pattern insertion", "3. Watermark reading phase" * * figure 2 * | [X] - DELANNAY D ET AL, "Generalized 2-D cyclic patterns for secret watermark generation", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 2000 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEPTEMBER 10-13, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000910), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-6297-7, pages 77 - 79, XP010529927 [X] 32,33,35-42,44-49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2000.899230 | [X] - YAO ZHAO ET AL, "Video watermarking scheme resistant to geometric attacks", PROCEEDINGS 2002 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2002. ROCHESTER, NY, SEPT. 22 - 25, 2002, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020922), VOL. 2 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7622-6, pages 145 - 148, XP010607929 [X] 32,35,36,38,39,41,44,45,47,48 * sections "1. Introduction", "2. Embedding process", "3. Extraction process" * |