EP1530022 - Thickness measurement method of a resin joint boot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO., LTD . 17-18, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO., LTD . 17-18, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohshita, Takenori Toyo Tire & Rubber Co. Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome Nishiku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Imazu, Eiichi Toyo Tire & Rubber Co. Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome Nishiku Osaka / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Takeshi Toyo Tire & Rubber Co. Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome Nishiku Osaka / JP | 04 /
Saito, Katsushi Toyo Tire & Rubber Co. Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome Nishiku Osaka / JP | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03025821.4 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530022 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
G01B11/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Dickemessverfahren für eine Dichtungsmanschette aus Harz | [2005/19] | English: | Thickness measurement method of a resin joint boot | [2005/19] | French: | Procédé de mesure de l'épaisseur d'un soufflet de joint en resine | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09159418 ; | [A]JPS63253205 ; | [X]DE4232201 (SP REIFENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-7 * * column 2, lines 4-8 * * column 2, lines 25-27 * * column 2, lines 55,56 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, lines 24-52 * * column 5, lines 16-22 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09159418 A 19970620 (SUMITOMO HEAVY IND LTD;SUMIJIYUU TANASHI KIKAI KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0016] , [0021] , [0024] , [0031] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890214), vol. 013, no. 064, Database accession no. (P - 827), & JP63253205 A 19881020 (NICHIZOU TEC:KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |