EP1418403 - Apparatus, server, and system for assisting safe driving [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Masahiro 302 Rea Stage 234-26, Kamitsuruma Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03025846.1 | 11.11.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | JP20020327025 | 11.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002327025 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418403 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418403 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G01C21/3697 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/27] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät, Server, und System zur Fahrsicherheitsunterstützung | [2004/20] | English: | Apparatus, server, and system for assisting safe driving | [2004/20] | French: | Appareil, serveur, et système d'assistance de conduite sans risque | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5504482 (SCHREDER KENNETH D [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,14,16-19 * column 1, line 6 - line 17 * * column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 2 * * column 13, line 15 - line 57 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19638703 (MOECOM HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT FUE [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,14,17-19 * abstract *; | [X]EP0840138 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * figure 1; claims 1,5,7 ** column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 11 *; | [X]WO0155744 (ORIGIN TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11,14,17-19 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 7 * * claim 1 * * figures 3,5A,5B,8,9A *; | [X]US6405132 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * claims 1,9-20,22-24,26-29,49 * * figures 4,5,12A,12B,12C,13-15 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 65 * * column 17, line 12 - line 18 * * column 28, line 20 - line 67 * * column 31, line 40 - column 35, line 46 * * column 46, line 38 - line 46 * * column 53, line 21 - line 28 * * column 58, line 8 - line 18 * * column 64, line 31 - line 33 * * column 68, line 40 - line 58 * * column 69, line 50 - column 72, line 62 * * column 74, line 56 - column 75, line 10 * * column 80, line 51 - column 82, line 31 * |