EP1421961 - Self-aligning shield for syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DiBiasi, Michael A. 48 Skyview Road West Milford New Jersey 07480 / US | 02 /
Phan, Vu 24 Lilac Street Edison New Jersey 08817 / US | 03 /
Scovell, Daniel B. 28 Farmington Circle West Grove Pennsylvania 19390 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03025865.1 | 11.11.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | US20020294978 | 14.11.2002 Original published format: US 294978 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1421961 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1421961 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00, A61M5/178 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61M5/3202 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61M5/321 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/22] | A61M5/178, A61J1/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/17] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Selbstausrichtende Abschirmung für Spritzen | [2004/22] | English: | Self-aligning shield for syringe | [2004/22] | French: | Protecteur à alignement automatique pour seringue | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 05.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4232669 (NITSHKE NORMAN L) [A] 3 * column 4, line 44 - line 51 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0499481 (WAVERLEY PHARMA LTD [GB]) [A] 7,8 * column 8, line 40 - line 46 ** figure 2 *; | [XA]US5232029 (KNOX KENNETH H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 9; | [A]EP0587347 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 3 * column 4, line 38 - line 44 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US5566729 (GRABENKORT RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 4-6,9 * column 5, line 2 - line 10 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5649912 (PETERSON STEVEN F [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 5 - line 15 * * figures 2,4B *; | [A]EP1228776 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 36 - line 40 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US4944736 | US5356406 | US6200291 |