EP1452244 - An intercept valve for highpressure water guns in water-cleaning machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arrow Line S.R.L. 5, Via Alberti 42048 Rubiera (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amaduzzi, Roberto Via Pedagna, 28 42048 Rubiera (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via P. Borsellino, 22 42124 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A., No 22, via Paolo Borsellino 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 03026369.3 | 18.11.2003 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | IT2003RE00022 | 26.02.2003 Original published format: IT re20030022 | [2004/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452244 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1452244 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02, B05B12/00, B05B7/02, B08B9/02, B05B9/01 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
B05B9/01 (EP,US);
B05B1/302 (EP,US);
B05B12/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/04] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein Sperrventil für eine Hochdruckspritzpistole eines Wasserreinigungsapparats | [2004/36] | English: | An intercept valve for highpressure water guns in water-cleaning machines | [2004/36] | French: | Une vanne d'arrêt pour injecteurs d'eau haute pression des appareils de nettoyage d'eau | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/23] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB594914 (AEROSTYLE LTD, et al) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 41; figure 1 *; | [X]US3840158 (BAKER R, et al) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 35 - column 7, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3109845 (FORTSCHRITT VEB K [DD]) [A] 1-4 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]US4709859 (SCHULZE WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8716405U (WESTERGAARD, KNUD ERIK, HADSUND, DK) [A] 1-4* abstract * |